U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00247
  • Case Name: McMullin v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2017: [Reconsideration]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 22, 2017: [Dismiss]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Response (generic)]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order]
  • October 27, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2016: [Stay]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 21, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.