U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00249
  • Case Name: Valenzuela v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 12, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order]
  • March 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2017: [Dismiss]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 15, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • July 13, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2016: [Stay]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order]
  • June 27, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 24, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 22, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 22, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • June 22, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.