U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00248
  • Case Name: Preal v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2017: [Dismiss]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 08, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 02, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2016: [Stay]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 16, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 22, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.