U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00257
  • Case Name: Massey v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2017: [Dismiss]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 14, 2016: [Stay]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 24, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 22, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 22, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.