U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00252
  • Case Name: Fletcher v. Corizon Health Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 05, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 19, 2018: [Order]
  • March 19, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • January 06, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 05, 2017: [Reconsideration]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Request]
  • November 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 16, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 16, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 03, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order]
  • August 03, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • July 12, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 22, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • June 22, 2016: [Complaint]
  • June 22, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • June 22, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.