U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00253
  • Case Name: Dick v. Kempf et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 10, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 20, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 06, 2017: [Request]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 23, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 16, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 04, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • May 02, 2017: [Hearing]
  • May 02, 2017: [Errata]
  • May 02, 2017: [Letter]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • May 02, 2017: [Compel]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 17, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 05, 2017: [Request]
  • April 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Disclosure Statement]
  • February 17, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 26, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Receipt]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 22, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • June 22, 2016: [Complaint]
  • June 22, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • June 22, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.