U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00268
  • Case Name: Farish v. Bechtel Marine Propulsion Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 30, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Stipulation]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [ADR Plan]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 04, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 02, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Status Report]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 23, 2016: [Errata]
  • June 22, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.