U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00264
  • Case Name: Bagwell v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • November 04, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • November 04, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Response (generic)]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order]
  • July 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 20, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 22, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • June 22, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.