U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00266
  • Case Name: McCoy v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 07, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order]
  • August 08, 2017: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • August 07, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • November 28, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 06, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 15, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • July 15, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 22, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.