U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00271
  • Case Name: Bodybuilding.com, LLC v. PhD Fitness, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 26, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 01, 2017: [Stipulation]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 14, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 28, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • November 21, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 21, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
  • November 18, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 10, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 04, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 03, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 03, 2016: [Counterclaim]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 07, 2016: [Errata]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 26, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 20, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 19, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 19, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 01, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order]
  • August 25, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order]
  • August 19, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 19, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 08, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • August 08, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 28, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 26, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 15, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 14, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 14, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • July 12, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 29, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 23, 2016: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • June 23, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 23, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 22, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.