U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00259
  • Case Name: Reyes v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • November 15, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • November 15, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 01, 2016: [Response (generic)]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order]
  • October 27, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2016: [Stay]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 22, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.