U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00258
  • Case Name: Johnson v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Letter]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • September 30, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 26, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 22, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.