U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00255
  • Case Name: Geisser v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Order]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 15, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • February 22, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • February 22, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • February 09, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • February 08, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 07, 2017: [Stay]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • January 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 21, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 22, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.