U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00261
  • Case Name: VonBargen v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 03, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • May 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 01, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 09, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 23, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.