U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00272
  • Case Name: Miller et al v. Trust Financial LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 13, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 26, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 26, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 25, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 23, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 23, 2016: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order]
  • June 22, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.