U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00260
  • Case Name: Loredo v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • October 04, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
  • July 27, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 23, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.