U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00270
  • Case Name: Lopez v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Sealed Document]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 07, 2017: [Dismiss]
February, 2017
  • February 04, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • February 02, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 21, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 23, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.