U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00269
  • Case Name: Broncheau v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • April 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
  • November 18, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 17, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order Staying Case]
  • July 18, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 14, 2016: [Stay]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 23, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.