U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00274
  • Case Name: Clemens v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [Response (generic)]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 07, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 24, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.