U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00275
  • Case Name: Sawyer v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 27, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 27, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Response (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 21, 2016: [Seal Document]
  • December 15, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 01, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • November 01, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 16, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • September 02, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • June 28, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 24, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • June 24, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 24, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.