U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00263
  • Case Name: Auser v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • September 30, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 12, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 28, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.