U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00283
  • Case Name: Douglas et al v. Fruitland, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order]
  • January 12, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • January 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 06, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • December 01, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Disclosure Statement]
  • September 23, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 09, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 07, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 06, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 01, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Disclosure Statement]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order]
  • August 24, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 05, 2016: [Errata]
  • August 05, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 27, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 07, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 24, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 24, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 24, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.