U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00276
  • Case Name: Kurkowski v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [USCA Order]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • February 27, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • February 13, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • February 13, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 01, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 27, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.