U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00284
  • Case Name: Rojas v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Response (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order]
  • November 30, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 30, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 26, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 27, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 27, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • June 27, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.