U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00285
  • Case Name: Rhino Metals, Inc. v. Kodiak Safe Company, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release of Bond Obligation]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 24, 2018: [Costs Taxed]
  • May 08, 2018: [Release of Bond Obligation]
  • May 08, 2018: [Entry of Judgment]
  • May 08, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • May 08, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • April 25, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 02, 2018: [Stay]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 20, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • February 20, 2018: [Seal]
  • February 20, 2018: [Entry of Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • December 15, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • December 13, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 12, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 12, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 07, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 27, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Transcript]
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Response to Objection to R&R]
  • April 11, 2017: [Errata]
  • April 10, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 28, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 07, 2016: [Seal]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 11, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 04, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 09, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 26, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 22, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 22, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • August 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 19, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 19, 2016: [Stay]
  • August 04, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 28, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 26, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 21, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • June 28, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 27, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.