U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00282
  • Case Name: Ward v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [USCA Order]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [USCA Order]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
  • January 28, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [USCA Order]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [USCA Order]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 19, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • October 11, 2016: [Response (generic)]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 23, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 10, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.