U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00279
  • Case Name: Foss v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [USCA Order]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 28, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • December 01, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Receipt]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 10, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 04, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 04, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • July 12, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 12, 2016: [Consent Filed]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 27, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.