U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00278
  • Case Name: May v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 13, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 10, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 07, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2017: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 02, 2017: [Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order]
  • October 18, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Consent Filed]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 27, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • June 27, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • June 27, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.