U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00286
  • Case Name: Camacho v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [USCA Order]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 14, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Response (generic)]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • January 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Waive]
  • August 21, 2018: [Request]
  • August 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2018: [Waive]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • April 12, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Return Mail]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Order]
  • January 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 26, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • November 08, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order]
  • November 08, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Reopen Case]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • November 29, 2016: [Withdraw]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 28, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.