U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00281
  • Case Name: Crowley v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Stay]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Continue]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 15, 2016: [Continue]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 28, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.