U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00287
  • Case Name: Andoe v. Kemph et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [USCA Order]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 25, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 15, 2018: [Letter]
  • June 12, 2018: [Letter]
  • June 12, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 05, 2018: [Letter]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 25, 2018: [USCA Order]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Default Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2017: [Supplement]
  • September 12, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 05, 2017: [Letter]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Letter]
  • August 11, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [USCA Memorandum]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [USCA Order]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [USCA Order]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [USCA Order]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Request]
  • December 02, 2016: [Letter]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Strike]
  • November 08, 2016: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2016: [Request]
  • November 02, 2016: [Letter]
  • November 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 19, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • October 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Letter]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Supplement]
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 19, 2016: [Letter]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2016: [Reassign Case]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 29, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 29, 2016: [Joinder]
  • June 29, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 29, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • June 29, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 29, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • June 29, 2016: [Complaint]
  • June 29, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 29, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.