U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00290
  • Case Name: Whiteley v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 23, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • August 18, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 03, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 03, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 03, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 02, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 02, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 29, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.