U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00289
  • Case Name: Medina-Martinez v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Stay]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 04, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.