U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00254
  • Case Name: Cook v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Order]
  • May 01, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • November 30, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 16, 2016: [Response (generic)]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 14, 2016: [Stay]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 30, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.