U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00262
  • Case Name: Smith v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • October 07, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • October 07, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Response (generic)]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Order]
  • August 11, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 05, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.