U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00294
  • Case Name: Brown v. United Parcel Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 31, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • January 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 05, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
November, 2016
  • November 25, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 28, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order]
  • October 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • October 11, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 11, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 11, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 28, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 28, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 28, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 28, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 15, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Summons Issued]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.