U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00293
  • Case Name: Noriega v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 30, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • November 14, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • October 12, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • August 16, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 06, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 06, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • June 30, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.