U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00296
  • Case Name: Smith et al v. Best Buy Stores, L.P.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 27, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Docket Entry Order to File Lodged Document]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Order]
  • August 14, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • July 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • July 11, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • July 11, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 11, 2017: [Discovery]
  • July 11, 2017: [Protective Order]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 28, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 28, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 28, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • November 02, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 02, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order]
  • October 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 18, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 06, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 06, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 20, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 07, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Status Report]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Summons Issued]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.