U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00292
  • Case Name: Thometz v. Corizon Medical Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Death]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 12, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 13, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order]
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 28, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 04, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 04, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Request]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Receipt]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • July 12, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 01, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • July 01, 2016: [Complaint]
  • July 01, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • July 01, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.