U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00297
  • Case Name: Briscoe et al v. Fay Servicing, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 04, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 07, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • July 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 28, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 05, 2016: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • July 01, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 01, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.