U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00298
  • Case Name: McAuliffe v. Bonner County, Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 21, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 07, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 03, 2017: [Status Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order]
  • October 26, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 19, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 19, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 22, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 07, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Consent Filed]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 11, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • July 01, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 01, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.