U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00299
  • Case Name: Nez Perce Tribe et al v. Probert et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 12, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • August 12, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • August 04, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 02, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 06, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 02, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.