U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00300
  • Case Name: Loew v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 03, 2019: [Letter]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Letter]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Stay]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • July 05, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.