U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cv-00157
  • Case Name: Loew v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [USCA Order]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Supplement]
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • April 14, 2017: [Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [USCA Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.