U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00301
  • Case Name: Cornelison v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • October 18, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Response to Habeas Petition]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 25, 2017: [Receipt]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 06, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 06, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • July 06, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.