U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00303
  • Case Name: Gussie v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 08, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 11, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 03, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 03, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 04, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • July 14, 2016: [Supplement]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 13, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • July 13, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • July 11, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 06, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.