U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00306
  • Case Name: Storm et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 09, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order]
  • October 26, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 26, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 19, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 15, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 07, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.