U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00307
  • Case Name: Kreps v. Experian Information Systems, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 15, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order]
  • March 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 14, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order]
  • October 14, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 07, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 01, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order]
  • August 24, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 15, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 15, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • July 07, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.