U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00309
  • Case Name: Workman et al v. Kempf et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 29, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 26, 2018: [Joinder]
  • November 26, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2018: [Joinder]
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 12, 2018: [Declaration]
  • November 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 08, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Joinder]
  • October 25, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2018: [Joinder]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • October 22, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 12, 2018: [Letter]
  • October 04, 2018: [Consolidate Cases]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • September 25, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 19, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2018: [Supplement]
  • April 05, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 19, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 22, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 18, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • April 04, 2017: [Letter]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • October 20, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order]
  • October 20, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Letter]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 12, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • July 12, 2016: [Complaint]
  • July 12, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • July 12, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.