U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00313
  • Case Name: Jaimes-Oliveros v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Return Mail]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Response (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 09, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 08, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Order]
  • August 11, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • July 12, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.